EP1638129 - Light emitting screen structure and image forming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.07.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.08.2012 [2012/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tagawa, Masahiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Takamatsu, Osamu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Hayashida, Matsuya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/12] | 01 /
Tagawa, Masahiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Takamatsu, Osamu Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Hayasida, Matsuya Canon Kabushiki Kaisha 3-30-2, Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/12] | Weser, Wolfgang Weser & Kollegen, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020234.0 | 16.09.2005 | [2006/12] | Priority number, date | JP20040272794 | 21.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004272794 | JP20050258742 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005258742 | [2006/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1638129 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1638129 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J31/12 | [2006/12] | CPC: |
H01J29/085 (EP,US);
H01J1/30 (KR);
H01J29/28 (EP,US);
H01J31/12 (KR);
H01J31/127 (EP,US);
H01J2329/08 (EP,US);
H01J2329/28 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/29] |
Former [2006/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Strahlungsemittierender Bildschirm und Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2006/12] | English: | Light emitting screen structure and image forming apparatus | [2006/12] | French: | Ecran électroluminescent et appareil de formation d'images | [2006/12] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/25] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0704877 (PIXTECH SA [FR]) [X] 1-3,6 * column 6, line 11 - column 7, line 10 * [Y] 4; | [A]EP0866491 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-6* figure 19; claims 1-9 *; | [Y]EP1432004 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0034] - [0037] - [0047] , [0048] *; | [XY]US6771236 (KONISHI MORIKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,6 * column 26, line 40 - column 27, line 20; figures 12a,13b,14a * [Y] 4 | Examination | JP2001351510 | US2004135505 |