EP1647331 - Method for sorting construction waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stadler Anlagenbau GmbH Robert-Bosch-Strasse 4 88361 Altshausen / DE | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kosch, Stefan Paerdendyckweg 6 46509 Xanten / DE | 02 /
Stadler, Wilhelm Am Haldenmoos 14 88361 Altshausen / DE | 03 /
Hüskens, Jürgen Vorster-Strasse 22 41748 Viersen / DE | 04 /
Sigmund, Ulrich Laubbronnen 2 88326 Aulendorf / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss, Brecht, Arat Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020336.3 | 19.09.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041050026 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050026 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1647331 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B03B9/06 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B03B9/065 (EP);
Y02W30/58 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Sortieren von Baumischabfällen | [2006/16] | English: | Method for sorting construction waste | [2006/16] | French: | Procédé pour trier de déchets de matériaux de construction | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/30] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3888351 (WILSON DAVID G) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * the whole document * [A] 7,13,16-18; | [XA]FR2261075 (ETEL SA [CH]) [X] 1,7,10-12,14,15 * the whole document *[A] 16-18; | [X]DE4235956 (RWE ENTSORGUNG AG [DE]) [X] 1,8-18 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4309671 (GAZ INDUSTRIEANLAGEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,8-11,14,16-18 [A] ; | [XA]WO03045590 (STADLER ANLAGENBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,10,11,14 * the whole document * [A] 16-18 |