EP1643633 - Circuit with suppression of unwanted signals , and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Entropic Communications, Inc. 6290 Sequence Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/43] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Trident Microsystems (Far East) Ltd. Ugland House South Church Street Grand Cayman / KY | ||
Former [2006/14] | For all designated states Micronas GmbH Hans-Bunte-Strasse 19 79108 Freiburg i. Br. / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinbach, Ingo Burgackerweg 10 79104 Freiburg / DE | 02 /
Fiesel, Hans Alte Bundesstrasse 22a 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | 03 /
Temerinac, Miodrang Klosterweg 2a 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/20] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Göhring, Robert Westphal - Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2006/14] | Göhring, Robert Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020455.1 | 20.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | DE20041048572 | 04.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004048572 | [2006/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1643633 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H03D1/22 | [2006/14] | CPC: |
H03D1/2245 (EP,US);
H04N7/015 (KR);
H04N7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2006/50] |
Former [2006/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Unterdrückung einer Störung , sowie Verfahren | [2006/14] | English: | Circuit with suppression of unwanted signals , and method | [2006/14] | French: | Circuit utilisant suppression de signaux faux , et procédé | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn | 25.02.2013 | Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted | 17.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/36] | 25.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2006 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 08.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request procedure closed | 18.02.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.2012 | 30.09.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4484194 (ARVIDSSON ERIK R [SE]) [A] 1-27 * figures 5,6 *; | [A]US4729110 (WELLES II KENNETH B [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0948128 (MOTOROLA SEMICONDUCTEURS [FR]) [A] 1-27* figure 1 *; | [X]WO0105025 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1 * page 5, line 18 - page 8, line 5; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2002097812 (WISS JOHN [US]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2003203728 (FILIPOVIC DANIEL F [US]) [A] 1-27 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0050]; figure 4 * | by applicant | WO0105025 |