EP1650965 - Display device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Robert M. Hewlett-Packard Co. 1000 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, Oregon 97330-4239 / US | 02 /
Dwyer, Daniel R. 18110 SE 34th Street Vancouver, WA 98683 / US | 03 /
Cole, James. R. 1000 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, OR 97330-4239 / US | 04 /
Dickie, James, P. 1000 NE Circle Boulevard Corvallis, OR 97330-4239 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020582.2 | 21.09.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | US20040970759 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: US 970759 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650965 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
H04N9/3141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anzeigevorrichtung | [2006/17] | English: | Display device | [2006/17] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/25] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH03201787 ; | [A]JPH01289933 ; | [A]US5285287 (SHIKAMA SHINSUKE [JP]) [A] 1-10* figures 4,5 *; | [A]US6137547 (IIJIMA JUN [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US6525750 (KNOX RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 3b * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911126), vol. 015, no. 465, Database accession no. (E - 1138), & JP03201787 A 19910903 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900209), vol. 014, no. 072, Database accession no. (P - 1004), & JP01289933 A 19891121 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-10 * abstract * |