EP1641281 - Techniques for decoding and reconstructing media objects from a still visual representation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2019/19] |
Former [2006/13] | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erol, Berna c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 02 /
Hull, Jonathan J. c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 03 /
Graham, Jamey c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 04 /
Lee, Dar-Shyang c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cupertino CA 95014 / US | 05 /
Hart, Peter c/o Ricoh Innovations Corporation 10050 North Wolfe Road Suite SW2-260 Cpertino CA 95014 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2006/13] | 01 /
Erol, Berna Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | ||
02 /
Hull, Jonathan J. Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | |||
03 /
Graham, Jamey Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | |||
04 /
Lee, Dar-Shyang Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | |||
05 /
Hart, Peter Ricoh Innovations, Inc. California Research Center 2882 Sand Hill Road Suite 115 Menlo Park CA 94025-7022 / US | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [2019/19] |
Former [2006/13] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05020586.3 | 21.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | US20040953439 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: US 953439 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1641281 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1641281 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N19/61, H04N19/85, H04N19/90 | [2018/22] | CPC: |
H04N1/00326 (EP,US);
H04N1/00334 (EP,US);
H04N19/61 (EP,US);
H04N19/85 (EP,US);
H04N19/90 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3269 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3271 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/13] | H04N7/50, H04N7/26, H04N7/24, H04N1/32, G06K7/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/19] |
Former [2006/49] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Dekodierung und Rekonstruktion von Medienobjekten aus statischen visuellen Repräsentationen | [2006/13] | English: | Techniques for decoding and reconstructing media objects from a still visual representation | [2006/13] | French: | Décodage et reconstruction des objets média d'une représentation visuelle statique | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 21.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/13] | 30.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 11.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2011 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0670555 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-21 * abstract * * column 2, line 23 - column 4, line 28 * * column 12, line 25 - column 13, line 4; figure 2 * * column 22, line 15 - column 29, line 47; figures 15-17 * * figures 22,89,90,101 *; | [XA]EP0926879 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 4,11,18 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0029]; figures 4a-4c * [A] 1-3,5-10,12-17,19-21; | [XA]US6641053 (BREIDENBACH JEFF [US], et al) [X] 1-3,8-10,15-17 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 2 * * column 6, line 49 - column 9, line 7; figures 3-6 * * column 13, line 16 - column 14, line 8; figures 9,13 * [A] 4-7,11-14,18-21; | [A]EP1387560 (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 2,9,16 * abstract ** figures 6-8 *; | [XA]US2004181747 (HULL JONATHAN J [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13,15-20 * abstract * * paragraphs 35-46, 52-55, 66, 83-85, 90-91, 95, 99, 107-112, 123-129, 134 * * figures 1,2,7,9,12,20 * [A] 7,14,21; | [X] - MOTWANI RAKHI C ET AL, "Collocated dataglyphs for large message storage and retrieval", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING; SECURITY, STEGANOGRAPHY, AND WATERMAKING OF MULTIMEDIA CONTENTS VI 2004, (20040119), vol. 5306, pages 173 - 183, XP002361632 [X] 1-21 * abstract * * sections 1, 6 and 7 with figures 6,7,8,12 and 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.527150 | [XA] - HULL J J ET AL, "Visualizing multimedia content on paper documents: components of key frame selection for video paper", DOCUMENT ANALYSIS AND RECOGNITION, 2003. PROCEEDINGS. SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON AUG. 3-6, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20030803), ISBN 0-7695-1960-1, pages 389 - 392, XP010656793 [X] 1-6,8-13,15-20 * abstract * * page 389, column L, paragraph L - page 389, column R, paragraph 4 * * page 391, column L, paragraph 2 - page 391, column R, paragraph 1; figure 1 * [A] 7,14,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDAR.2003.1227695 | [A] - REES D ET AL, "The CLICK (CSIRO Laboratory for Imaging by Content and Knowledge) Security Demonstrator", SECURITY TECHNOLOGY, 1997. PROCEEDINGS. THE INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS 31ST ANNUAL 1997 INTERNATIONAL CARNAHAN CONFERENCE ON CANBERRA, ACT, AUSTRALIA 15-17 OCT. 1997, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19971015), ISBN 0-7803-3913-4, pages 190 - 201, XP010248882 [A] 1-21 * page 196, column L, paragraph 2 - page 198, column R, paragraph 2 * * in particular: page 197, right column, last paragraph - page 198, left column, first paragraph * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CCST.1997.626550 |