EP1613089 - Object-based audio-visual terminal and corresponding bitstream structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2007 [2007/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York Broadway and West 116th Street New York, NY 10027-6699 / US | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eleftheriadis, Alexandros Columbia University Dept.of Electrical Engineering 500 West 120th St New York NY 10027-6699 / US | 02 /
Kalva, Hari Columbia University Dept.of Electrical Engineering 500 West 120th St New York NY 10027-6699 / US | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Lawrence, John Barker Brettell, 138 Hagley Road, Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05020777.8 | 13.02.1998 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | US19970037779 | 14.02.1997 Original published format: US 37779 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1613089 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
H04N19/00 (EP);
H04N19/20 (EP);
H04N19/44 (EP);
H04N21/23412 (EP);
H04N21/234318 (EP);
H04N21/44012 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/01] | Title | German: | Objektbasiertes audiovisuelles Endgerät und entsprechende Bitstromstruktur | [2006/01] | English: | Object-based audio-visual terminal and corresponding bitstream structure | [2006/01] | French: | Terminal audio-visuel basé sur des objets et structure de flux binaire correspondente | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/15] | 22.11.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/15] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02075022.0 / EP1209915 | EP98906337.5 / EP1010318 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2006 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0858228 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-6,8,9,15-19 * column 2, line 8 - line 25 * * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 17 * * column 10, line 31 - column 11, line 45 * * column 13, line 30 - column 14, line 25 * * column 25, line 11 - line 21 *; | [X] - ELEFTHERIADIS A ET AL, "A Proposed Architecture for an Object-Based Audio-Visual Bitstream and Terminal", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 MPEG97/M1619, Seville, ES, (19970202), pages 1 - 9, XP002240420 [X] 1-6,8,9,11-19 * the whole document * | [A] - KNOLL A, "MSDL: MPEG-4-SYSTEMS AND DESCRIPTION LANGUAGES", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK, VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, DE, (19960801), vol. 50, no. 8/9, ISSN 0015-0142, pages 459 - 460,462,464-, XP000636467 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - READER C, "MPEG4: CODING FOR CONTENT, INTERACTIVITY, AND UNIVERSAL ACCESSIBILITY", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, US, (1996), vol. 35, no. 1, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 104 - 108, XP000631416 [A] 1-19 * page 105, column R, paragraph 3 - page 107, column L, line L * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.600879 | [A] - ISO/IEC AD HOC GROUP ON MPEG-4 VIDEO VM EDITING, "MPEG-4 VIDEO VERIFICATION MODEL VERSION 5.0", ISO/IEC JTC1/SC29/WG11 MPEG96/N1469, XX, XX, (199611), pages 1 - 165, XP000992566 [A] 1-19 * page 5, line 1 - page 8, line 2 * * page 74, paragraph 3.9 - page 106, paragraph 4.6 * * page 124, paragraph 5.1 * |