EP1767798 - Superconducting magnetic bearing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nexans 16, rue de Monceau 75008 Paris / FR | [2007/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Heribert Eschenbergweg 9 37081 Göttingen / DE | 02 /
Bock, Joachim Am Burgfeldt 51 50374 Erftstadt / DE | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Feray, Valérie Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39-41, Avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/33] | Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Consult 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92163 Antony / FR | ||
Former [2007/13] | Feray, Valérie Feray Lenne Conseil 39/41, avenue Aristide Briand 92160 Antony / FR | Application number, filing date | 05020778.6 | 23.09.2005 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1767798 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16C32/04 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
F16C32/0438 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Title | German: | Supraleitendes Magnetlager | [2007/13] | English: | Superconducting magnetic bearing | [2007/13] | French: | palier magnétique supraconductive | [2007/13] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 07.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/25] | 01.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0694030 ; | [X]JPH05180227 ; | [X]JPH02163513 ; | [Y]US3377113 (WILSON DONALD S) [Y] 9-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5220232 (RIGNEY II THOMAS K [US], et al) [A] 1,2,12 * the whole document *; | [A]US5256638 (WEINBERGER BERNARD R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0575619 (KOYO SEIKO CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 3, line 38 - column 6, line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19643844 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [XY]DE19938079 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,12 * column 3, line 20 - line 63; figure 1 * [Y] 9-11; | [X]EP1172575 (KENDRO LAB PROD GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0063] , [0064]; figures 3,5 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940708), vol. 018, no. 363, Database accession no. (M - 1635), & JP06094030 A 19940405 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931108), vol. 017, no. 604, Database accession no. (M - 1506), & JP05180227 A 19930720 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900910), vol. 014, no. 418, Database accession no. (M - 1022), & JP02163513 A 19900622 (KOYO SEIKO CO LTD) [X] 1,6 * abstract * |