EP1650441 - Low vibration vacuum pump [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH Berliner Strasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | [2014/31] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Pfeiffer Vacuum GmbH Berliner Strasse 43 35614 Asslar / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bernhardt, Helmut Am Rabenbaum 33A 35584 Wetzlar / DE | 02 /
Blecker, Armin Talstrasse 5 35614 Asslar / DE | 03 /
Reichhart, Anneliese Schulstrasse 19 35614 Asslar / DE | 04 /
Stanzel, Jörg Am Pfeiffer 3 35583 Wetzlar / DE | 05 /
Eberl, Wolfgang Im Borngrund 24 35606 Solms / DE | 06 /
Rippl, Christopher Mark Bergstrasse 32 35578 Wetzlar / DE | 07 /
Willig, Michael Am Zäun 2 35633 Lahnau / DE | [2006/27] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
Bernhardt, Helmut Am Rabenbaum 33A 35584 Wetzlar / DE | ||
02 /
Blecker, Armin Talstrasse 5 35614 Asslar / DE | |||
03 /
Reichhart, Heinz Schulstrasse 19 35614 Asslar / DE | |||
04 /
Stanzel, Jörg Am Pfeiffer 3 35583 Wetzlar / DE | |||
05 /
Eberl, Wolfgang Im Borngrund 24 35606 Solms / DE | |||
06 /
Rippl, Christopher Mark Bergstrasse 32 35578 Wetzlar / DE | |||
07 /
Willig, Michael Am Zäun 2 35633 Lahnau / DE | Representative(s) | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Knefel, Cordula Patentanwälte Knefel & Knefel Postfach 19 24 35529 Wetzlar / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021097.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | DE20041050743 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004050743 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650441 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650441 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650441 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/66, F04D19/04 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
F04D19/04 (EP);
F04D29/668 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Vibrationsarme Vakuumpumpe | [2006/17] | English: | Low vibration vacuum pump | [2006/17] | French: | Pompe à vide à faible vibration | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 11.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 10.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2005 | CY | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | AT | 28.09.2014 | IE | 28.09.2014 | LU | 28.09.2014 | BE | 30.09.2014 | CH | 30.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | LI | 30.09.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.09.2005 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.09.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
AT | 28.09.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 28.09.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.09.2014 | ||
LI | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
LU | 28.09.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2249985 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [X] 1-4,6,13 * page 1, line 1 * * page 3, line 33 * * page 4, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE2412584 (AIRCO INC) [Y] 15 * page 8, line 11 - line 12 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]DE8608801U (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 7,8,10,11 * page 5, line 9 - line 19 * * page 5, line 20 * * page 5, line 21 * * page 5, line 26 * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0581966 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [Y] 9,12 * abstract ** column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 4 *; | [XY]DE19712711 (PFEIFFER VACUUM GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,13 * column 2, line 13 * * column 2, line 23 * * column 2, line 15 - line 16 * * column 2, line 32 - line 34 * * figure 1 * [Y] 7-12,14,15; | [Y]EP1293682 (BOC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [JP]) [Y] 14 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE2249985 | DE3537822 | DE19712711 | DE10117075 | - JOUMAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY A, (198905), vol. 7, no. 311, pages 2377 - 2380 |