Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7040282 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2006 | B2 | US2006065236 | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US95570704 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006105137 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US95570704 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1643121 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2007 | A3 | EP1643121 | 05.04.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US95570704 | 30.09.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1755100 | 05.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US95570704 | 30.09.2004 |