EP1646210 - IP telephone apparatus for selection of a communication service based on call rates and service availability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyajima, Akira 1-19-31-A1001, Nakatehara Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 222-0023 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Kazuto 2-4-15-303, Hisamoto Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-0011 / JP | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021153.1 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | JP20040292864 | 05.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004292864 | [2006/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1646210 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/253, H04M1/2745, H04M15/00 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04M1/2535 (EP,US);
H04M1/253 (KR);
H04L12/66 (KR);
H04L61/4557 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US);
H04M1/2746 (EP,US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04M15/55 (EP,US);
H04M15/8044 (EP,US);
H04M2215/2046 (EP,US);
H04M2215/42 (EP,US);
H04M2215/745 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/51] |
Former [2006/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IP-basiertes Telefon zur Auswahl eines Kommunikationsdienstes basierend auf Rufgebühren und Dienstverfügbarkeit | [2006/15] | English: | IP telephone apparatus for selection of a communication service based on call rates and service availability | [2006/15] | French: | Dispositif de téléphonie IP pour la sélection d'un service de communication dépendant du coût d'appel et de la disponibilité du service | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/15] | 23.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/19] | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.05.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1061728 (TELEDIS TELECOM DIENSTLEISTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0012] , [0013] *; | [A]US6498797 (ANEROUSIS NIKOLAOS [US], et al) [A] 1-4* column 8, line 64 - column 9, line 15 *; | [Y]US2003214940 (TAKKEN TODD E [US]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0042] * * abstract *; | [Y] - FALTSTROM CISCO SYSTEMS INC P, "E.164 number and DNS", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200009), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015008699 [Y] 1-4 * page 8 - page 9 * * abstract * | by applicant | JPH08130594 | JP2004292864 |