04.04.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
26.04.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
24.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.04.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.01.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.04.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.04.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.02.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.11.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.09.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.09.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.09.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
06.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.07.2007 [2007/30] |
04.05.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
01.05.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2007 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.11.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
01.11.2006 |
New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.10.2006 |
First examination report |
|
21.10.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.10.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2006 [2006/46] |
10.02.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |