EP1640836 - Centrally managed proxy-based security for legacy automation systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rockwell Automation Technologies, Inc. 1 Allen-Bradley Drive Mayfield Heights, OH 44124 / US | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brandt, David D. 3271 S 54th Street Milwaukee, WI 53219 / US | 02 /
Bush, Michael A. 7129 Colesbrooke Drive Hudson, Ohio 44236 / US | 03 /
Anderson, Mark H. 8809 Oconee Court Chapel Hill, North Carolina 27516 / US | 04 /
Batke, Brian A. 15149 Hook Hollow Road Novelty, Ohio 44072 / US | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Englaender, Klaus, et al HML Patentanwälte Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/13] | Jung HML Schraudolphstrasse 3 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021180.4 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | US20040952317 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: US 952317 | [2006/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640836 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1640836 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
G05B19/4185 (EP,US);
H04L63/0281 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31241 (EP,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,US);
Y02P90/80 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2006/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zentral verwaltete Proxy-basierte Sicherheit für Legacy-Automatisierungssysteme | [2006/13] | English: | Centrally managed proxy-based security for legacy automation systems | [2006/13] | French: | Sécurité proxy gérée centralement pour les systèmes d'automatisation hérités | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/46] | 30.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2006 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.05.2013 | [2014/11] | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]WO0126338 (SENSORIA CORP [US], et al) [Y] 6,11,13,16,19 * page 22, line 15 - line 22 * * page 19, line 19 - line 30 * [A] 8; | [XY]US2003208448 (PERRY STUART [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,9,10,14,15,17,20 * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0081] * * paragraph [0012] * [Y] 6,11-13,16,19; | [YA]US2004138834 (BLACKETT ANDREW W [CA], et al) [Y] 12[A] 17,18 |