EP1640296 - Conveyor for bottom discharge of silos and for preventing the formation of bridges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHW Storage & Handling Solutions GmbH Wilhelmstrasse 67 73433 Aalen-Wasseralfingen / DE | [2006/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schröder, Klaus-Sweerich Hegelstrasse 14 73431 Aalen / DE | 02 /
Quitte, Jens Malm Strasse 17 73433 Aalen / DE | 03 /
Timmermann, Stephan Dr. Mauerstrasse 40 73430 Aalen / DE | [2006/13] | Representative(s) | Wess, Wolfgang Schwabe Sandmair Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | [2008/42] |
Former [2006/13] | Wess, Wolfgang Schwabe-Sandmair-Marx, Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021196.0 | 28.09.2005 | [2006/13] | Priority number, date | DE20041046993 | 28.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004046993 | [2006/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1640296 | Date: | 29.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65G65/46, B65G65/42, B65D88/68 | [2006/13] | CPC: |
B65G65/466 (EP,US);
B65D88/68 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/13] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Förderung von Schüttgut und zur Verhinderung von Brückenbildung | [2006/13] | English: | Conveyor for bottom discharge of silos and for preventing the formation of bridges | [2006/13] | French: | Dispositif pour vider des silos et pour empêcher la formation de ponts | [2006/13] | Examination procedure | 08.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 08.06.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/13] | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE1921066 (WEISS GEB KG) [X] 1,2,13-16,18,19 * figures 1-3 * * page 3, lines 11-21 * * page 6, lines 18-21 * * page 7, lines 1-4 * * page 8, lines 5,6 * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 17; | [Y]FR2060035 (NOLTING HERBERT KESSE [DE]) [Y] 17 * page 5, lines 1-5; figure 2 *; | [A]DE2642821 (WEISS GEB) [A] 1,18,19 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4105494 (PETTERSSON BENGT EDVARD) [A] 1,13-15,19* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4392591 (FASSAUER ARTHUR L) [A] 1,13-15,19 * figures 1,2B * |