Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] |
22.02.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |
07.11.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.10.2007 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.05.2007 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
17.11.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
03.11.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
27.10.2006 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
03.06.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
19.05.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] |
10.02.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |