EP1621219 - Intraocular implants for preventing transplant rejection in the eye [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2007 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, CA 92612 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine CA 92612 / US | ||
Former [2006/05] | For all designated states ALLERGAN, INC. 2525 Dupont Drive Irvine, California 92623-9534 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wong, Vernon, G. 180 Sand Hill Circle Menlo Park CA 94025 / US | [2006/05] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/05] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05021226.5 | 28.11.2001 | [2006/05] | Priority number, date | US20000250023P | 29.11.2000 Original published format: US 250023 P | US20010298253P | 12.06.2001 Original published format: US 298253 P | [2006/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1621219 | Date: | 01.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1621219 | Date: | 22.03.2006 | [2006/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/54, A61K9/00, A61K31/573, A61P37/06, A61P27/02, A61L31/16 | [2006/05] | CPC: |
A61K9/0051 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2006/05] | Title | German: | Intraokulare Implantate zur Verhinderung von Transplantatabstossung im Auge | [2006/05] | English: | Intraocular implants for preventing transplant rejection in the eye | [2006/05] | French: | Implants intra-oculaires pour la prévention du rejet de greffe de l'oeil | [2006/05] | Examination procedure | 06.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 24.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.03.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/35] | 10.04.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01986027.9 / EP1339438 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4863457 (LEE DAVID A [US]) [X] 1-26 * column A * * column 4, line 28 - line 39 * * column 6, line 58 - line 61 *; | [X]EP0430539 (VISIONEX INC [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 4, line 16 - line 18 *; | [X]EP0488401 (SENJU PHARMA CO [JP]) [X] 1-26 * abstract *; | [X]WO9638174 (OCULEX PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 2, line 15 - line 20 * * page 4, line 16 - page 5, line 21 *; | [X]WO0002564 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 4, line 20 - line 27; claim 23 *; | [X]WO0037056 (OCULEX PHARM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-26 * page 3, line 16 - line 22; examples 1-7 * * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 30 *; | [X] - APEL A ET AL, "A SUBCONJUNCTIVAL DEGRADABLE IMPLANT FOR CYCLOSPORINE DELIVERY IN CORNEAL TRANSPLANT THERAPY", CURRENT EYE RESEARCH, IRL PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (199508), vol. 14, no. 8, ISSN 0271-3683, pages 659 - 667, XP001083691 [X] 1-26 * abstract * * "Polymer devices" on page 660 final para. of the discussion * | [X] - TAN D T H ET AL, "RANDOMIZED CLINICAL TRIAL OF A NEW DEXAMETHASONE DELIVERY SYSTEM (SURODEX) FOR TREATMENT OF POST-CATARACT SURGERY INFLAMMATION", OPHTHALMOLOGY, J. B. LIPPINCOTT CO., PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (199902), vol. 106, no. 2, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 223 - 231, XP001083687 [X] 1-26 * page 223, column 1, line 1 - page 224, column 1, line 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-6420(99)90060-X | [X] - MORITA Y ET AL, "INTRAVITREOUS DELIVERY OF DEXAMETHASONE SODIUM M-SOLFOBENZOATE FROM POLY(DL-LACTIC ACID) IMPLANTS", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, TOKYO, JP, (199802), vol. 21, no. 2, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 188 - 190, XP001084085 [X] 1-26 * abstract * * "preparation of ocular implants" on page 188 * | [X] - GOULD L ET AL, "FIFTY:FIFTY POLY (DL GLYCOLIC ACID-LACTIC ACID) COPOLYMER AS A DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM FOR 5-FLUOROURACIL: A HISTOPATHOLOGICAL EVALUATION", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, (199408), vol. 29, no. 4, ISSN 0008-4182, pages 168 - 171, XP001083692 [X] 1-26 * abstract * * "methods" on page 169 * | [X] - DAVIS P A ET AL, "INTRAOCULAR IMPLANT FOR CONTROLLED 5-FLUOROURACIL RELEASE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CONTROLLED RELEASE BIOACTIVE MATERIALS, (1992), vol. 19, ISSN 1022-0178, pages 339 - 340, XP001084532 [X] 1-26 * Introduction, Experimental Methods and Conclusions * | [X] - CHENG C-K ET AL, "Intravitreal sustained-release dexamethasone device in the treatment of experimental uveitis", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE 1995 UNITED STATES, (1995), vol. 36, no. 2, ISSN 0146-0404, pages 442 - 453, XP009045224 [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 443, column 1, line 29 - line 42 * | [X] - CHANG DAVID F ET AL, "Phase II results of an intraocular steroid delivery system for cataract surgery", OPHTHALMOLOGY, (199906), vol. 106, no. 6, ISSN 0161-6420, pages 1172 - 1177, XP001205585 [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 1172, column 2, line 15 - page 1173, column 1, line 6 * | [X] - ZHOU T ET AL, "Development of a multiple-drug delivery implant for intraocular management of proliferative vitreoretinopathy", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19981113), vol. 55, no. 2-3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 281 - 295, XP004143523 [X] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(98)00061-3 | [X] - KUNOU NORIYUKI ET AL, "Biodegradable scleral implant for controlled intraocular delivery of betamethasone phosphate", J BIOMED MATER RES; JOURNAL OF BIOMEDICAL MATERIALS RESEARCH 2000 JOHN WILEY & SONS INC, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (2000), vol. 51, no. 4, pages 635 - 641, XP001205588 [X] 1-26 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1097-4636(20000915)51:4<635::AID-JBM11>3.0.CO;2-O | [X] - MORITA Y ET AL, "POLYMER BLEND IMPLANT FOR OCULAR DELIVERY OF FLUOROMETHOLONE", BIOLOGICAL & PHARMACEUTICAL BULLETIN (OF JAPAN), PHARMACEUTICAL SOCIETY OF JAPAN, JP, (1998), vol. 21, no. 1, ISSN 0918-6158, pages 72 - 75, XP000738276 [X] 1-26 * abstract * | [X] - ROBIN JEFFREY B. ET AL, "The histopathology of corneal neovascularization. Inhibitor effects", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1985), Database accession no. 1985:219200, URL: STN, XP002285068 [X] 1-26 * abstract * | [X] - TABA K E ET AL, "Intravitreal sustained release fluocinolone implant inhibits experimental choroidal neovascularization", IOVS, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY; FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA, USA; MAY 9-14, 1999, (19990315), vol. 40, no. 4, page S172, XP009045225 [X] 1-26 * abstract * | [X] - BINGAMAN D P ET AL, "Inhibition of preretinal neovascularization in pigs by intravitreal triamcinolone acetonide", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY AND VISUAL SCIENCE; FORT LAUDERDALE, FLORIDA, USA; MAY 14-19, 1995, (1995), vol. 36, no. 4, ISSN 0146-0404, page S401, XP009045218 [X] 1-26 * abstract * |