EP1612578 - Method of operating a radar sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2013 [2013/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bircher Reglomat AG Hauptstrasse 22 9042 Speicher / CH | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mezger, Klaus Robach 27 CH-9038 Rehetobel / CH | 02 /
Audergon, Léon Türlimattstrasse 6 8404 Winterthur / CH | [2006/09] |
Former [2006/04] | 01 /
Mezger, Klaus Robach 27 CH-9038 Rehetobel / CH | ||
02 /
Audergon, Léon Speicherstrasse 25 9000 St. Gallen / CH | |||
Former [2006/01] | 01 /
Mezger, Klaus Robach 27 CH-9038 Rehetobel / CH | ||
02 /
Audergon, Léon Speicherstrasse 25 CH-9000 St. Gallen / CH | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter, et al Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/01] | Weiss, Peter, et al Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021231.5 | 09.03.2004 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | DE2003138536 | 19.08.2003 Original published format: DE 10338536 | [2006/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612578 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1612578 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/04, G01S13/06, G01S13/34, G01S17/02, H01Q3/30, H01Q1/38, H01Q21/06, H01Q23/00, E05F15/14, E05F15/20, G01S7/40, H01Q3/26 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
E05F15/73 (EP,US);
E05F15/665 (US);
G01S13/04 (EP,US);
G01S13/06 (EP,US);
G01S13/34 (EP,US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S7/40 (EP,US);
G01S7/4004 (US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US);
H01Q21/064 (EP,US);
H01Q23/00 (EP,US);
H01Q3/267 (EP,US);
H01Q3/30 (EP,US);
E05F15/632 (EP,US);
E05F2015/433 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben eines Radarsensors | [2006/01] | English: | Method of operating a radar sensor | [2006/01] | French: | Procédé de fonctionnement d'un radar | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 10.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.02.2009 | 19.01.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 05.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.02.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04005531.1 / EP1508818 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.07.2009 | CZ | 15.07.2009 | DK | 15.07.2009 | EE | 15.07.2009 | FI | 15.07.2009 | IE | 15.07.2009 | IT | 15.07.2009 | NL | 15.07.2009 | PL | 15.07.2009 | RO | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | SI | 15.07.2009 | SK | 15.07.2009 | TR | 15.07.2009 | BG | 15.10.2009 | GR | 16.10.2009 | ES | 26.10.2009 | PT | 15.11.2009 | HU | 16.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | AT | 09.03.2010 | GB | 09.03.2010 | LU | 09.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | CH | 31.03.2010 | FR | 31.03.2010 | LI | 31.03.2010 | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
TR | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
AT | 09.03.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
LU | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
AT | 09.03.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
LU | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
FI | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
HU | 16.01.2010 | ||
AT | 09.03.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 15.07.2009 | |
CZ | 15.07.2009 | ||
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.03.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
AT | 09.03.2010 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
GB | 09.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IT | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.03.2010 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
FR | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
GR | 16.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 15.07.2009 | |
DK | 15.07.2009 | ||
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
RO | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
SK | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | DK | 15.07.2009 | |
EE | 15.07.2009 | ||
IE | 15.07.2009 | ||
NL | 15.07.2009 | ||
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | NL | 15.07.2009 | |
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
BG | 15.10.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | ||
PT | 15.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | NL | 15.07.2009 | |
PL | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
SI | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4217426 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [A] 1-29 * column 3, lines 20-25; figure 1c *; | [Y]US5294934 (MATSUMOTO SOICHI [JP]) [Y] 1-29 * column 6, line 1 - line 20; figure 2 *; | [Y]US5867123 (GEYH EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * column 3, line 31 - column 4, line 4; figure 2 *; | [Y]US6220627 (STANLEY JAMES G [US]) [Y] 1-29 * column 11, line 54 - line 56 * * column 14, line 47 - line 58 *; | [Y]DE10012115 (AGTA RECORD AG FEHRALTORF [CH]) [Y] 1-29 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6366237 (CHARLES JEAN-PIERRE [FR]) [Y] 1-29* abstract *; | [Y]WO03054333 (B E A HOLDINGS INC [US]) [Y] 1-29 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4217426 | US5294934 | US5867123 | US6220627 | DE10012115 | US6366237 | WO03054333 |