EP1645836 - Device for measuring length or velocity of a moving object [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, LU, TR | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK STEGMANN GmbH Dürrheimer Strasse 36 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | [2006/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siraky, Josef Brigachtalstrasse 31 78166 Donaueschingen / DE | 02 /
Wölfle, Bernhard Unterdorfstrasse 18/1 78073 Bad Dürrheim / DE | [2006/15] | Representative(s) | Mussgnug, Bernd Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | Mussgnug, Bernd Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021300.8 | 29.09.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | DE20042015570U | 06.10.2004 Original published format: DE 202004015570 U | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1645836 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1645836 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/04, G01B3/12, G01P3/50 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G01B3/12 (EP,US);
G01P3/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zur Messung von Weg oder Geschwindigkeit eines bewegten Objektes | [2006/15] | English: | Device for measuring length or velocity of a moving object | [2006/15] | French: | Dispositif pour mesurer longeur ou vitesse d'un objet en mouvement | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 18.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 03.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.08.2007 | CZ | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | EE | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | GB | 29.08.2007 | IE | 29.08.2007 | LT | 29.08.2007 | LV | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | PL | 29.08.2007 | RO | 29.08.2007 | SI | 29.08.2007 | SK | 29.08.2007 | TR | 29.08.2007 | AT | 29.09.2007 | LU | 29.09.2007 | BE | 30.09.2007 | MC | 30.09.2007 | BG | 29.11.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | ES | 10.12.2007 | IS | 29.12.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | HU | 01.03.2008 | [2009/45] |
Former [2009/29] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SI | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
AT | 29.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
EE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
AT | 29.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
AT | 29.09.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
BE | 30.09.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
RO | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 29.08.2007 | |
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
GB | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
SK | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | DK | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 30.09.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/17] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
LV | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
PL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | FI | 29.08.2007 | |
LT | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
IS | 29.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | LT | 29.08.2007 | |
ES | 10.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | LT | 29.08.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3539782 (UPSHUR LITTLETON) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 45 - line 58 * * column 3, line 9 - line 43 ** figures 2,3 *; | [X]US4577411 (MARTIN MERRILL D [US]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 6 - column 3, line 30 * * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US4700484 (FRANK JIMMY I [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 60 - column 5, line 15 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DD271248 (KRAMATORSKIJ NII PROEKTNOTECHN [SU]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2342719 (BALABAN ENGINEERING CO LTD [GB]) [A] 1-8 * page 2, line 5 - line 12 * * page 3, line 18 - line 27 * * figure 3 * |