EP1643464 - Multi-application smartcard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vayssiere, Julien JP. 24 Surrey Street Red Hill, QLD 4059 / AU | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021322.2 | 29.09.2005 | [2006/14] | Priority number, date | US20040954382 | 29.09.2004 Original published format: US 954382 | [2006/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1643464 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1643464 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | [2006/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1643464 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10, G06K19/07 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3278 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3574 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | G07F7/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Title | German: | Chipkarte für mehrere Anwendungen | [2006/14] | English: | Multi-application smartcard | [2006/14] | French: | Carte à puce multi-application | [2006/14] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 23.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.11.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.03.2011 | BE | 16.03.2011 | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IT | 16.03.2011 | LT | 16.03.2011 | LV | 16.03.2011 | NL | 16.03.2011 | PL | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SE | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | GR | 17.06.2011 | ES | 27.06.2011 | IS | 16.07.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | IE | 29.09.2011 | LU | 29.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
LU | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
IE | 29.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
PL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
NL | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
IS | 16.07.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
BE | 16.03.2011 | ||
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | AT | 16.03.2011 | |
CY | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
LT | 16.03.2011 | ||
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.03.2011 | |
LV | 16.03.2011 | ||
SE | 16.03.2011 | ||
GR | 17.06.2011 | ||
ES | 27.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9938117 (VIZTEC INC [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * page 4, line 9 - page 7, line 17 * * page 11, line 15 - line 18 * * page 12, line 11 - line 29 * * page 16, line 3 - line 13 * * page 16, line 22 - line 31 * * page 17, line 3 - line 12 * * page 17, line 31 - page 18, line 6 * * page 19, line 3 - line 21 *; | [X]US2002167500 (GELBMAN ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0087] ** paragraph [0129] - paragraph [0130]; figure 20 *; | [X]US2002195493 (DELL JASON S [US]) [X] 1-28 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] *; | [X]US2003220876 (BURGER TODD O [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * paragraph [0103] * * paragraph [0105] * * paragraph [0156] - paragraph [0173] * | Examination | US6515649 |