EP1645927 - Hydraulically controllable pressure reducing valve and operating method for a hydraulically controllable pressure reducing valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.2008 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG Graf-von-Soden-Platz 1 88046 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/15] | For all designated states ZF Friedrichshafen AG 88038 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huber, Roland Marienhöhe 12/9 4391 Waldhausen / AT | [2006/15] | Application number, filing date | 05021565.6 | 01.10.2005 | [2006/15] | Priority number, date | DE20041049325 | 09.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049325 | [2006/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1645927 | Date: | 12.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1645927 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05D16/10 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
G05D16/103 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hydraulisch schaltbares Druckminderventil und Verfahren zum Betreiben eines hydraulisch schaltbaren Druckminderventils | [2006/15] | English: | Hydraulically controllable pressure reducing valve and operating method for a hydraulically controllable pressure reducing valve | [2006/15] | French: | Vanne de réduction de pression à commande hydraulique et procédé de mise en oeuvre d'une vanne de réduction de pression à commande hydraulique | [2006/15] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/44] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2952267 (SMIL REIS) [A] 1-8,10-12 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3307568 (BERTHOLD GARTNER) [A] 1-8,10-12 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2413704 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]JPH05164223 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-12 * abstract *; | [A]US2004138025 (YAMAGUCHI KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8,10-12 * figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DD275901 |