EP1617043 - Method for cooling a wall within a gas turbine engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: GB | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | ||
Former [2006/03] | For all designated states UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORPORATION United Technologies Building, 1 Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lafleur, Ronald S. 14 Chestnut Street Potsdam, NY 13676 / US | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Leckey, David Herbert Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 05021709.0 | 05.10.2000 | [2006/03] | Priority number, date | US19990412274 | 05.10.1999 Original published format: US 412274 | [2006/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1617043 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1617043 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/18, F01D25/12 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
F01D5/186 (EP,US);
F01D25/12 (EP,US);
F01D5/187 (EP,US);
F05D2260/202 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2212 (EP,US);
F05D2260/2214 (EP,US);
F05D2260/22141 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/03] | Title | German: | Methode zur Kühlung einer Wand in einer Gasturbine | [2006/03] | English: | Method for cooling a wall within a gas turbine engine | [2006/03] | French: | Méthode de refroidissement d'une paroi dans une turbine à gaz | [2006/03] | Examination procedure | 09.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 14.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00308788.9 / EP1091091 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.10.2008 | [2013/46] |
Former [2010/01] | GB | 05.10.2008 | |
FR | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FR | 31.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1257041 (ROLLS-ROYCE) [X] 1-3 * figure 6 *; | [X]US4278400 (YAMARIK GEORGE J, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 7 *; | [X]EP0742347 (ALLISON ENGINE CO INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * column 7, lines 13-27 - column 11, lines 1-5; figure 4 *; | [X]US5649806 (SCRICCA JOSEPH A [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 8-15 *; | [X]EP0896127 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1 * column 6, lines 14-36 - column 7, lines 53-56; figures 1,1A * * column 10, lines 40-45 *; | [A]EP0945595 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4* column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 10 *; | [E]WO0100964 (ALLISON ADVANCED DEV CO [US], et al) [E] 1-4 * figures 3-6 *; | [E]EP1091092 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [E] 1-3 * figures 4,5 * |