EP1650074 - Methode for controlling a heating device for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Webasto AG Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lang, Alexander Boostrasse 4 81541 München / DE | [2006/17] | Application number, filing date | 05021799.1 | 06.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | DE20041051989 | 25.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051989 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1650074 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1650074 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/02, B60H1/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
B60H1/2206 (EP,US);
B60H1/00642 (EP,US);
B60H1/0073 (EP,US);
B60H2001/2256 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Ansteuern eines Heizgeräts für Kraftfahrzeuge | [2006/17] | English: | Methode for controlling a heating device for a vehicle | [2006/17] | French: | Procédé de control d'un chauffage pour un véhicule | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/50] | 24.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | FI | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | LV | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | PL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | SE | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | ES | 20.07.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | PT | 10.09.2008 | AT | 06.10.2008 | LU | 06.10.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 06.10.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 06.10.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 06.10.2008 | ||
LU | 06.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
AT | 06.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CY | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | CZ | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | DK | 09.04.2008 | |
FI | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
SE | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | FI | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
PT | 10.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
ES | 20.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004158371 (IGGULDEN JERRY [US], et al) [X] 1-9* the whole document * | by applicant | DE10019895 |