EP1648130 - Method for suppressing the side lobes in OFDM communication systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2006/24] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Südstrasse 125 53175 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schnell, Michael, Dr. Schmidgern 2 82205 Gilching / DE | 02 /
Brandes, Sinja Kopernikusweg 3 85375 Neufahrn / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2009/17] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | von Kirschbaum, Albrecht Waldstrasse 2b 82110 Germering / DE | Application number, filing date | 05021907.0 | 08.10.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041049802 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049802 | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1648130 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1648130 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | [2006/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648130 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
H04L27/2626 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/26265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Verfahren zu Unterdrückung spektraler Nebenzipfel in auf OFDM beruhenden Übertragungssystemen | [2006/16] | English: | Method for suppressing the side lobes in OFDM communication systems | [2006/16] | French: | Méthode pour l'élimination des lobes secondaires dans les systèmes de communication OFDM | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 16.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.04.2008 | 22.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 02.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.07.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 14.07.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IE | 03.09.2008 | IT | 03.09.2008 | LT | 03.09.2008 | LV | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | AT | 08.10.2008 | LU | 08.10.2008 | BE | 31.10.2008 | MC | 31.10.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | IS | 03.01.2009 | PT | 03.02.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 03.09.2008 | |
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
TR | 03.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 03.09.2008 | |
CZ | 03.09.2008 | ||
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LU | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
AT | 08.10.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
IT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BE | 31.10.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
MC | 31.10.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/15] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
LV | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6035000 (BINGHAM JOHN A C [US]) [X] 1-24 * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 54 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 6 * * column 9, line 28 - line 31 *; | [XA]WO0038386 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-9,11-27 * page 9, line 12 - column 11, line L * [A] 10; | [A]EP1422897 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) [A] 1-27 * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0035] , [0037] , [0038] , [0048] *; | [PX]WO2004105336 (GLOBESPAN VIRATA INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-9,11,12,15,16* Gleich.16,19,20,23 *; | [PX]US2005047535 (AHMED NADEEM [US], et al) [PX] 1-9,11,12,15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0052] *; | [XA] - BALDEMAIR, R., "Suppression of narrow frequency bands in multicarrier transmission systems", EUSIPCO - PROCEEDINGS OF THE X EUROPEAN SIGNAL PROCESSING CONFERENCE, Tampere, Finland, (20000904), pages 553 - 556, XP002372892 [X] 1-9,11-27 * paragraph [0002] * [A] 10 | [A] - YOO H ET AL, "EDGE SIDELOBE SUPPRESSOR SCHEME FOR OFDMA UPLINK SYSTEMS", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200311), vol. 7, no. 11, ISSN 1089-7798, pages 534 - 536, XP001185628 [A] 1-27 * Absatz III.Proposed ESS * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCOMM.2003.820098 | [PX] - BRANDES S ET AL, "Reduction of out-of-band radiation in OFDM based overlay systems", NEW FRONTIERS IN DYNAMIC SPECTRUM ACCESS NETWORKS, 2005. DYSPAN 2005. 2005 FIRST IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON BALTIMORE, MD, USA 8-11 NOV. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051108), ISBN 1-4244-0013-9, pages 662 - 665, XP010855171 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DYSPAN.2005.1542691 | [PX] - BRANDES S ET AL, "Sidelobe suppression in OFDM systems by insertion of cancellation carriers", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 2005. VTC-2005-FALL. 2005 IEEE 62ND DALLAS, TX, USA 25-28 SEPT., 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050928), ISBN 0-7803-9152-7, pages 152 - 156, XP010878440 [PX] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECF.2005.1557490 |