Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
03.04.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.09.2011 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.07.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
03.08.2009 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
03.08.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
29.01.2009 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
02.09.2008 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
02.09.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.06.2008 | First examination report | |
19.06.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
16.11.2007 | Change - representative | published on 19.12.2007 [2007/51] |
03.08.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.08.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
02.08.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant | |
25.11.2005 | Change - French title | published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |
19.11.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
19.11.2005 | Request for examination filed | published on 04.01.2006 [2006/01] |
19.10.2005 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |