Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1612745 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP24356499 | 30.08.1999 | EP00307424 | 30.08.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3793377B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2006 | B2 | JP2001069140 | 16.03.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | JP24356499 | 30.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1083529 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2007 | B1 | EP1083529 | 07.01.2004 | A3 | EP1083529 | 14.03.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP24356499 | 30.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60032693T | 10.05.2007 | T2 | DE60032693D1 | 15.02.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP24356499 | 30.08.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7058804 | 06.06.2006 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP24356499 | 30.08.1999 | Type | Earlier application | EP1083529 |