EP1612745 - Data storing system, issuing apparatus, data providing apparatus and computer readable medium storing data storing program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON TELEGRAPH AND TELEPHONE CORPORATION 3-1, Otemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2006/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akashika, Hideki c/O NTT 911, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Ohyama, Nagaaki c/O NTT 911, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Hirata, Shinichi c/O NTT 911, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Kokubu, Akio c/O NTT 911, Midori-cho 3-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | [2006/01] | Representative(s) | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 12th Floor Cale Cross House 156 Pilgrim Street Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street 156 Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2007/51] | Vinsome, Rex Martin, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Cale Cross House Pilgrim Street Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 6SU / GB | ||
Former [2006/01] | Rees, Alexander Ellison Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 05022004.5 | 30.08.2000 | [2006/01] | Priority number, date | JP19990243564 | 30.08.1999 Original published format: JP 24356499 | [2006/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1612745 | Date: | 04.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G07F7/10 | [2006/01] | CPC: |
G07F7/1008 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/355 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3552 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40 (EP,US);
G06Q20/40975 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/36] |
Former [2006/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Datenspeichersystem, Ausgabevorrichtung, datenliefernde Vorrichtung und rechnerlesbares Medium zum Speichern eines Datenspeicherprogrammes | [2006/01] | English: | Data storing system, issuing apparatus, data providing apparatus and computer readable medium storing data storing program | [2006/01] | French: | Système de stockage de données, dispositif émetteur, dispositif fournisseur de données et support lisible par ordinateur pour la mémorisation d'un programme de stockage de données | [2006/01] | Examination procedure | 10.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/01] | 04.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00307424.2 / EP1083529 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000307424) is 07.10.2004 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 13.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0798673 (NEDERLAND PTT [NL]) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 20 - line 42 * * column 1, line 55 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 42 - line 48 * * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 28 * * column 6, line 31 - line 37 * * figures 3,6 *; | [A]EP0833241 (MITSUBISHI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 7 - line 29 * * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 11 * * column 5, line 55 - column 6, line 19 * * column 7, line 54 - column 8, line 10 * * column 8, line 25 - column 9, line 2 *; | [A]WO9843212 (VISA INT SERVICE ASS [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * page 3, line 22 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 1 - line 17 * * page 8, line 8 - page 9, line 2 * * page 10, line 1 - line 9 * * page 11, line 22 - page 12, line 11 * * page 13, line 5 - line 13 * * page 14, line 5 - page 15, line 11 * * page 19, line 7 - page 21, line 5 * * page 22, line 13 - line 16 * * figures 2,3A,3B *; | [X]WO9852161 (MONDEX INT LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4 * page 3, line 14 - page 6, line 18 * * page 8, line 20 - page 13, line 18 * * page 15, line 19 - page 17, line 10 * * page 19, line 13 - page 22, line 18 * * page 24, line 13 - page 25, line 17 * * page 30, line 17 - page 31, line 22 * * page 36, line 20 - page 38, line 2 * * page 39, line 3 - page 40, line 15 * * page 51, line 13 - page 52, line 19 * * page 63, line 1 - line 14 * * page 68, line 15 - page 76, line 15 * * page 78, line 7 - line 17 * * page 79, line 4 - line 10 * * page 80, line 10 - line 21 * * page 84, line 11 - line 19 * * page 85, line 17 - page 89, line 15 * * figures 1,2,9,11,A-1A,A-1B,A-11,B-9,B-10 *; | [A] - BRUNO L, "CERTIFICATE AUTHORITIES: WHO DO YOU TRUST?", DATA COMMUNICATIONS, MCGRAW HILL. NEW YORK, US, (19980321), vol. 27, no. 4, ISSN 0363-6399, pages 54 - 63, XP000740967 [A] 1-4 * the whole document * |