EP1650540 - sensor system for a chip forming machine tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARTIS Gesellschaft für angewandte Messtechnik mbH Sellhorner Weg 28-30 29646 Bispingen-Behringen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states ARTIS Ges. für angewandte Messtechnik mbH Sellhorner Weg 28-30 29646 Bispingen-Behringen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redecker, Volker Theodor-Storm-Strasse 1 29646 Bispingen / DE | 02 /
Lange, Dirk, Dr.-Ing. Knotterkamp 35 21335 Lüneburg / DE | 03 /
Brinkhaus, Jan-Wilm Kleine Pfahlstrasse 6 30161 Hannover / DE | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Hess, Peter K. G. Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Hess, Peter K. G. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenberg . Geissler Postfach 86 06 20 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022011.0 | 10.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | DE20041051145 | 20.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004051145 | [2006/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1650540 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1650540 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01L5/00, B23Q17/09 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
G01L5/0061 (EP,US);
B23Q1/0009 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0961 (EP,US);
B23Q17/0966 (EP,US);
B23Q17/098 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/17] | Title | German: | Sensorsystem für eine spanabhebende Werkzeugmaschine | [2006/17] | English: | sensor system for a chip forming machine tool | [2006/17] | French: | système de capteur pour machines-outils d'usinage par enlèvement de copeaux | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2009 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.11.2009 | 20.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 20.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/18] | 01.01.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2037995 (NORD MICRO ELECTRONIK FEINMECH) [X] 1-4,6,7,9,10,12-17,19 * page 1, lines 5-15,83-97 * * page 2, lines 14-22,113-115 * * page 3, lines 72-75,91-93,101-108; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3922556 (MANNER GABRIELE [DE]) [A] 1,19* column 1, lines 22-30,42-47; figure 1 *; | [X]DE19917626 (MAYR CHRISTIAN GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5-17,19 * column 1, lines 5-10,54-56 * * column 3, lines 50,51 * * column 5, line 47 - column 6, line 15 * * column 6, line 60 - column 7, line 30 * * column 8, lines 30-38; figures 1,2,4 *; | [DX]DE19926799 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [DX] 1-8,12,16-191 * column 1, lines 3-11 * * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 64; figures 1,2 *; | [DX]DE10163734 (GROWTH FINANCE AG ZUG [CH]) [DX] 1,2,5-19 * the whole document * |