EP1647480 - Joint covering for aircraft [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/48] |
Former [2006/16] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Granzeier, Werner Grosse Seite 7 21635 Jork / DE | 02 /
Wietzke, Andreas Neuberger Weg 87 a 22419 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Schröder, Jan Niflandring 19 22559 Hambrug / DE | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/16] | Dilg, Andreas Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH, Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022132.4 | 11.10.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | DE20041049893 | 13.10.2004 Original published format: DE102004049893 | US20040618130P | 13.10.2004 Original published format: US 618130 P | [2006/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1647480 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1647480 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1647480 | Date: | 08.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64C1/12 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
B64C1/066 (EP,US);
B60R13/02 (EP,US);
B60R13/06 (EP,US);
B61D17/18 (EP,US);
B64D11/00 (EP,US);
B64D2011/0038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Fugenabdeckung in Flugzeugen | [2006/16] | English: | Joint covering for aircraft | [2006/16] | French: | Couvre-joint pour aéronefs | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 20.08.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 28.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 08.12.2010 | CZ | 08.12.2010 | DK | 08.12.2010 | EE | 08.12.2010 | FI | 08.12.2010 | HU | 08.12.2010 | IE | 08.12.2010 | IT | 08.12.2010 | LT | 08.12.2010 | LV | 08.12.2010 | NL | 08.12.2010 | PL | 08.12.2010 | RO | 08.12.2010 | SE | 08.12.2010 | SI | 08.12.2010 | SK | 08.12.2010 | TR | 08.12.2010 | BG | 08.03.2011 | GR | 09.03.2011 | ES | 19.03.2011 | IS | 08.04.2011 | PT | 08.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
TR | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
IT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
DK | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
RO | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
PL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
SK | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
CZ | 08.12.2010 | ||
EE | 08.12.2010 | ||
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
IE | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
GR | 09.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
IS | 08.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
ES | 19.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 08.12.2010 | |
FI | 08.12.2010 | ||
LT | 08.12.2010 | ||
LV | 08.12.2010 | ||
NL | 08.12.2010 | ||
SE | 08.12.2010 | ||
SI | 08.12.2010 | ||
BG | 08.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 08.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2322244 (GREFCO [US]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * page 7, column 25 - page 9, column 16 * * page 10, column 34 - page 11, column 21; figure 4 *; | [X]US5014934 (MCCLAFLIN JAMES K [US]) [X] 1-3,5,10-13 * abstract * * column 4, line 4 - line 10; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5695154 (CASTELLUCCI NICHOLAS T [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,12,13* abstract *; | [AY]US6276634 (BODLE PETER WINSTANLEY [GB]) [A] 1 * abstract * [Y] 8,9; | [XY]EP1449764 (BOEING CO [US]) [X] 1-7,10-13 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012]; figures 3,4 * [Y] 8,9 | by applicant | US5014934 | US6276634 | EP1449764 |