EP1648004 - Dielectric ceramic composition with dielectric core-shell particles and electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8272 / JP | [2006/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Kazushige c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1,Nihonbashi,Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | 02 /
Sato, Akiro c/o TDK Corporation 1-13-1,Nihonbashi,Chuo-ku Tokyo, 103-8272 / JP | [2006/16] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022291.8 | 12.10.2005 | [2006/16] | Priority number, date | JP20040297874 | 12.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004297874 | [2006/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1648004 | Date: | 19.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1648004 | Date: | 18.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01G4/12 | [2006/16] | CPC: |
C04B35/4682 (EP,US);
C04B35/46 (KR);
C04B35/628 (EP,US);
C04B35/62805 (EP,US);
C04B35/62807 (EP,US);
C04B35/6281 (EP,US);
C04B35/62815 (EP,US);
C04B35/62818 (EP,US);
C04B35/62823 (EP,US);
C04B35/62886 (EP,US);
C04B35/62889 (EP,US);
C04B35/62894 (EP,US);
C04B35/62897 (EP,US);
H01B3/12 (EP,US);
H01G4/1209 (EP,US);
H01G4/1227 (EP,US);
B32B2311/22 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3203 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3205 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3206 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3208 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3213 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3215 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3239 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3249 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3256 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3258 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3418 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3427 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3454 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5436 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5445 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6582 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6584 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6588 (EP,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
C04B2235/721 (EP,US);
C04B2235/724 (EP,US);
C04B2235/726 (EP,US);
C04B2235/727 (EP,US);
C04B2235/785 (EP,US);
C04B2235/79 (EP,US);
C04B2235/85 (EP,US);
C04B2237/346 (EP,US);
C04B2237/405 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2993 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2996 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/16] | Title | German: | Dielektrische keramische Zusammensetzung mit dielektrischen Kern-Hülle Partikeln und elektronisches Gerät | [2006/16] | English: | Dielectric ceramic composition with dielectric core-shell particles and electronic device | [2006/16] | French: | Composition en céramique diélectrique avec les particules diélectriques de noyau-coquille et le dispositif électronique | [2006/16] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/16] | 06.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.02.2009 | BE | 18.02.2009 | CY | 18.02.2009 | CZ | 18.02.2009 | DK | 18.02.2009 | EE | 18.02.2009 | FI | 18.02.2009 | IT | 18.02.2009 | LT | 18.02.2009 | LV | 18.02.2009 | PL | 18.02.2009 | RO | 18.02.2009 | SI | 18.02.2009 | SK | 18.02.2009 | TR | 18.02.2009 | BG | 18.05.2009 | SE | 18.05.2009 | GR | 19.05.2009 | ES | 29.05.2009 | IS | 18.06.2009 | PT | 27.07.2009 | HU | 19.08.2009 | IE | 12.10.2009 | LU | 12.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
HU | 19.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.10.2009 | ||
LU | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
IE | 12.10.2009 | ||
LU | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
IT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
IE | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
GR | 19.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
IE | 12.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
BG | 18.05.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
EE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
RO | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SK | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
PT | 27.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
DK | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 18.02.2009 | |
BE | 18.02.2009 | ||
FI | 18.02.2009 | ||
LT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LV | 18.02.2009 | ||
PL | 18.02.2009 | ||
SI | 18.02.2009 | ||
SE | 18.05.2009 | ||
ES | 29.05.2009 | ||
IS | 18.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003048774 ; | [A]DE19945014 (EPCOS AG [DE]) [A] 1-6* page 3 - page 10 *; | [X]EP1128404 (TAIYO YUDEN KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figure 5; examples 1-3; claim 3 *; | [X]US2003218856 (CHAZONO HIROKAZU [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,2; example 2; claims 1-12 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20030603), vol. 2003, no. 06, & JP2003048774 A 20030221 (KYOCERA CORP) [X] 1-6 * abstract * |