Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] |
30.11.2007 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.11.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] |
22.11.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.03.2007 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] |