EP1679038 - Ultrasound diagnostic system and method of forming arbitrary m-mode images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114 Yangdukwon-ri, Nam-myun Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states MEDISON CO., LTD. 114, Yangdukwon-ri, Nam-myun, Hongchun-gun Kangwon-do 250-870 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jeong Hwan Samsung Raemian Apt. 105-502 256-1 Guro 3-dong Guro-gu Seoul 152-767 / KR | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Lorenz, Werner Lorenz & Kollegen Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alte Ulmer Strasse 2 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 05022972.3 | 21.10.2005 | [2006/28] | Priority number, date | KR20050000709 | 05.01.2005 Original published format: KR 2005000709 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1679038 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1679038 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/14 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61B8/486 (EP,US);
F16L3/137 (KR);
A61B8/14 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/51] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ultraschalldiagnosesystem und -verfahren zur Erstellung von Bildern im willkürlichen M-Modus | [2006/28] | English: | Ultrasound diagnostic system and method of forming arbitrary m-mode images | [2006/28] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de diagnostic à ultrason pour la formation d'images en mode m arbitraire | [2006/28] | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/15] | 21.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0838470 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] , [0029] - [0044] - [0049] , [0050]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5515856 (OLSTAD BJORN [NO], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph l - column 4, paragraph 2 ** column 5, paragraph 4 - column 6, paragraph 1 *; | [X]US5568812 (MURASHITA MASARU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * abstract * * column 6, paragraph 5 - column 8, paragraph 2 *; | [X]JP2002263105 (HITACHI MEDICAL CORP) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0020] - [0024]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004111028 (ABE YASUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8 * paragraphs [0115] - [0118]; figures 1-3,12 * |