EP1649821 - Bipolar forceps having monopolar extension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien AG Victor von Bruns-Strasse 19 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [2007/33] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Sherwood Services AG Bahnhofstrasse 29 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dumbauld, Patrick L. 142 Kelling Drive Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US | 02 /
Garrison, David M. 2324 Creekside Drive Longmont, Colorado 80504 / US | 03 /
Guerra, Paul 16500 Bonnie Lane Los Gatos CA 95032 / US | 04 /
Peterson, Darion 5428 Glendale Gulch Circle Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 05 /
Dycus, Sean T. 2735 Overlook Drive Broomfield, Colorado 80200 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2006/17] | 01 /
Dumbauld, Patrick L. 142 Kelling Drive Lyons, Colorado 80540 / US | ||
02 /
Garrison, David M. 2324 Creekside Drive Longmont, Colorado 80504 / US | |||
03 /
Guerra, Paul 2650 Iris Avenue, B21 Boulder Colorado 80304 / US | |||
04 /
Peterson, Darion 5428 Glendale Gulch Circle Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | |||
05 /
Dycus, Sean T. 2735 Overlook Drive Broomfield, Colorado 80200 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/17] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023017.6 | 21.10.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | US20040970307 | 21.10.2004 Original published format: US 970307 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649821 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1649821 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61B18/1445 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00196 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0063 (EP,US);
A61B2018/126 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1475 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bipolare elektrochirurgische Zange mit monopolaren Erweiterungselement | [2006/17] | English: | Bipolar forceps having monopolar extension | [2006/17] | French: | Pince électrochirurgicale bipolaire avec extension monopolaire | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 27.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10182019.9 / EP2316365 | EP10182022.3 / EP2316367 | EP15188519.1 / EP2990004 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2006 | Opposition(s) | 17.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.12.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.12.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9622056 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9940861 (BAKER JAMES A [US]) [Y] 3,4 * figures 14B-14C * * page 31, lines 8-10 *; | [A]US5984939 (YOON INBAE [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [Y]WO9966850 (LINA MEDICAL APS [DK], et al) [Y] 6 * page 12, lines 21-25 *; | [A]US6387094 (EITENMUELLER JUERGEN P [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2002099372 (SCHULZE DALE R [US], et al) [Y] 5 * figure 1 * * figure 3 * * figure 4 * * paragraph [0058] *; | [XY]WO02080796 (SHERWOOD SERV AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 1 * * figure 2 * * figures 5-6F * * page 1, lines 8-10 * * page 7, lines 10,11 * * page 9, lines 6-9 * * page 14, lines 13-16 * * page 16, lines 18,19 * * page 19, lines 1-13 * * page 24, lines 12-20 * * page 25, lines 3,4 * * page 30, lines 17-21 * * claim 1 * [Y] 3-6 |