EP1624440 - Image display device with plural signal output circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Displays, Ltd. 3300, Hayano Mobara-shi Chiba 297-8622 / JP | For all designated states Panasonic Liquid Crystal Display Co., Ltd. 1-6 Megahida-cho Shikama-ku, Himeji-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [2012/02] |
Former [2010/41] | For all designated states Hitachi Displays, Ltd. 3300, Hayano Mobara-shi Chiba 297-8622 / JP | ||
Former [2006/06] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akimoto, Hajime Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group 12th Floor,Marunouchi Cent. Bldg.,6-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Hiraki, Mitsuru 2-12-4-1 Tsuda-machi Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-0025 / JP | 03 /
Nakahara, Hitoshi Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Cent Bldg.,6-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 04 /
Akioka, Takashi Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group 12th Floor,Marunouchi Cent Bldg.,6-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 05 /
Kaneko, Yoshiyuki 2-3349-4 Motohachioji-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0826 / JP | 06 /
Tsumura, Makoto 1-16-1 Mikanohara-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken 316-0026 / JP | 07 /
Mikami, Yoshiro Hitachi Ltd., Intel. Prop. Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Cent Bldg.,6-1-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2006/21] |
Former [2006/06] | 01 /
Akimoto, Hajime 1-842-1-508 Kabe-cho Oume-shi Tokyo 198-0036 / JP | ||
02 /
Hiraki, Mitsuru 2-12-4-1 Tsuda-machi Kodaira-shi Tokyo 187-0025 / JP | |||
03 /
Nakahara, Hitoshi 1-211-201 Makinosato Meito-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi-ken 465-0068 / JP | |||
04 /
Akioka, Takashi 2-7-3-105 Mihori-cho Akishima-shi Tokyo 196-0001 / JP | |||
05 /
Kaneko, Yoshiyuki 2-3349-4 Motohachioji-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 193-0826 / JP | |||
06 /
Tsumura, Makoto 1-16-1 Mikanohara-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken 316-0026 / JP | |||
07 /
Mikami, Yoshiro 6-7-6-403 Omika-cho Hitachi-shi Ibaraki-ken 319-1221 / JP | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2006/06] | Application number, filing date | 05023190.1 | 20.09.1995 | [2006/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1624440 | Date: | 08.02.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
G09G3/3688 (EP);
G06F3/147 (EP);
G09G3/3611 (EP);
G09G2310/027 (EP);
G09G2320/10 (EP);
G09G2330/021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/06] | Title | German: | Bildanzeigevorrichtung mit mehreren Signalausgabeschaltungen | [2006/06] | English: | Image display device with plural signal output circuits | [2006/06] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage d'images avec plusieurs circuits de sortie de signaux | [2006/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/38] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2014 | 06.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/31] | 16.03.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 08.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95932184.5 / EP0852371 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19950932184) is 05.04.2002 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 19 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0416550 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 18; figure 2 *; | [X]JPH075853 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONIC) [X] 1-6 * figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP0655725 (ROHM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * column 2, line 52 - column 5, line 26; figures 2,3 *; | [E]US5523772 (LEE DAE-WON [KR]) [E] 1-6 * column 2, lines 9-21; figures 2,4 * * column 2, paragraph L ** column 3, lines 20-31 * |