EP1658855 - Use of substance p for mobilization or proliferation of mesenchymal stem cells and for wound healing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/21] | Use of substance P for mobilization or proliferation of mesenchymal stem cells and for wound healing | ||
[2006/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Institute of Radiological & Medical Sciences 215-4 Gongneung-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul 139-706 / KR | For all designated states Chung-Aug University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-070 / KR | [2009/09] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Korea Institute of Radiological & Medical Sciences 215-4 Gongneung-dong Nowon-gu, Seoul 139-706 / KR | ||
For all designated states Chung-Aug University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-070 / KR | |||
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Korea Atomic Energy Research Institute 215-4 Gongneung-dong Nowon-gu Seoul 139-240 / KR | ||
For all designated states Chung-Aug University Industry-Academy Cooperation Foundation 221 Heukseok-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-070 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Son, Young Sook Keangnam Apt. 11-505 1-8, Banpo 2-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-765 / KR | 02 /
Hong, Hyun Sook 584-20, Jayang 3-dong Kwangjin-gu Seoul 143-864 / KR | 03 /
Kim, Jae chan Woosung Apt. 3-305 Garak-dong Songpa-gu Seoul 138-160 / KR | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Wichmann, Hendrik Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Wichmann, Hendrik Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn, Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023367.5 | 26.10.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | KR20040086359 | 27.10.2004 Original published format: KR 2004086359 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1658855 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1658855 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658855 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/04, A61P17/02 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61K38/046 (EP,US);
A61K35/28 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/28, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/046, A61K2300/00 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [2006/21] | A61K38/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Substanz P zur Mobilisierung und Proliferation mesenchymaler Stammzellen und zur Wundheilung | [2006/21] | English: | Use of substance p for mobilization or proliferation of mesenchymal stem cells and for wound healing | [2006/22] | French: | Utilisation de la substance P pour la mobilisation et la prolifération de cellules souches mésenchymateuses et pour la cicatrisation des plaies | [2008/40] |
Former [2006/21] | Use of substance P for mobilization or proliferation of mesenchymal stem cells and for wound healing | ||
Former [2006/21] | Utilisation de la substance P pour la mobilisation et la prolifération de cellules souches mésenchymateuses | Examination procedure | 26.10.2005 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 17.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | LV | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | IE | 26.10.2009 | LU | 26.10.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | FR | 02.11.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
LU | 26.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 26.10.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
FR | 02.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LV | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5616562 (MURPHY CHRISTOPHER J [US], et al) [X] 2,6 * column 3, lines 27-30 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 11 * * examples 1-3; claims 1-7 *; | [X]WO9946366 (OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS INC [US]) [X] 7 * page 6, lines 6-9 * * page 6, lines 19-21 * * page 9, lines 30-34 *; | [X]US5998376 (WITTEN MARK L [US], et al) [X] 5,6 * column 4, lines 21-25 * * column 5, lines 26-31 *; | [X]WO0243748 (MILKHAUS LAB INC [US]) [X] 5,6 * page 2, lines 11-26 *; | [X]WO02102835 (NEW ENGLAND MEDICAL CT [US], et al) [X] 5,6 * page 9, line 30 - page 10, line 20 *; | [A]US2003225010 (RAMESHWAR PRANELA [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]WO2004022078 (ROYAL VETERINARY COLLEGE [GB], et al) [X] 7 * page 11, lines 9-21 *; | [XO] - SON Y; HONG H; KIM J, "Identification of Substance P as an early inductive cytokine of corneal wound and its possible role in the mobilization of mesenchymal stem cell and corneal wound healing", IOVS, Annual Meeting of the Association-for-Research-in-Vision-and-Ophthalmology; Ft. Lauderdale, FL, USA 24-29 April 2004, (20040426), vol. 45, no. Suppl.1, page U555, XP009064135 [XO] 1-9 * abstract * | [XO] - HYUN SOOK HONG, JAE CHAN KIM, YOUNGSOOK SON, "Novel role of Substance-p as a wound messenger to mobilize mesenchymal stem cells from bone marrow and recruit to the wound site", 2004 SEOUL SYMPOSIUM ON STEM CELL RESEARCH, (20040902), page 33, URL: http://www.stem.or.kr/data/data/file/%EC%84%B8%ED%8F%AC%EC%B4%88%EB%A1%9D(2004)_%EB%B0%B0%ED%8F%AC%EC%9A%A9.pdf, (20060323), XP002374187 [XO] 1-9 * abstract * |