EP1672751 - Lamp socket [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2008 [2008/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BJB GmbH & Co. KG Werler Strasse 1 59755 Arnsberg / DE | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lingemann, Erwin Max-Kolbe-Strasse 42 59757 Arnsberg / DE | 02 /
Vogt, Karl-Wilhelm Am Winkel 10 59469 Ense / DE | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Roche, von Westernhagen & Ehresmann Patentanwaltskanzlei Mäuerchen 16 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Patentanwälte Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Ostriga, Sonnet, Wirths & Roche Stresemannstrasse 6-8 42275 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023519.1 | 27.10.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | DE20041062414 | 20.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004062414 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672751 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672751 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R33/08, H01R13/639 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
H01R33/0809 (EP,US);
H01R13/639 (EP,US);
H01R13/506 (EP,US);
H01R13/6275 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2007/09] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lampenfassung | [2006/25] | English: | Lamp socket | [2006/25] | French: | Douille de lampe | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19625673 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2 * abstract * * column 3, line 8 - column 4, line 32; figure 7 * * column 15, line 60 - column 18, line 42 ** figures 21,22a,24a,24b,26-29 * |