EP1672242 - Engine support [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2006/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hettler, Werner Edenkobener Strasse 28 68309 Mannheim / DE | [2006/25] | Application number, filing date | 05023521.7 | 27.10.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | DE20041060499 | 16.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004060499 | [2006/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1672242 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1672242 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/373, F16F13/08 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
F16F1/3849 (EP);
F16F13/10 (EP);
F16F13/1409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Title | German: | Aggregatelager | [2006/25] | English: | Engine support | [2006/25] | French: | Support de moteur | [2006/25] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 25.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.12.2010 | CZ | 01.12.2010 | DK | 01.12.2010 | EE | 01.12.2010 | FI | 01.12.2010 | HU | 01.12.2010 | IE | 01.12.2010 | IT | 01.12.2010 | LT | 01.12.2010 | LV | 01.12.2010 | NL | 01.12.2010 | PL | 01.12.2010 | RO | 01.12.2010 | SE | 01.12.2010 | SI | 01.12.2010 | SK | 01.12.2010 | TR | 01.12.2010 | BG | 01.03.2011 | GR | 02.03.2011 | ES | 12.03.2011 | IS | 01.04.2011 | PT | 01.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
TR | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
IT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
DK | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
RO | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
PL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
SK | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
CZ | 01.12.2010 | ||
EE | 01.12.2010 | ||
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
IE | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
IS | 01.04.2011 | ||
PT | 01.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
ES | 12.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 01.12.2010 | |
FI | 01.12.2010 | ||
LT | 01.12.2010 | ||
LV | 01.12.2010 | ||
NL | 01.12.2010 | ||
SE | 01.12.2010 | ||
SI | 01.12.2010 | ||
BG | 01.03.2011 | ||
GR | 02.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 01.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19537462 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6; | [A]EP0896168 (TOKAI RUBBER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0957286 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 6,8 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0040]; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE10024535 (TRELLEBORG AUTOMOTIVE TECH CT [DE], et al) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [A]US2003127783 (WINKLER GEROLD [DE], et al) [A] 9 * abstract *; | [A]EP1336771 (GOMMA C F SPA [IT]) [A] 1,6,7 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0064]; compounds 1-7 *; | [XA]DE10230933 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,8,12 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0023]; figures 1-8 * [A] 6,11 |