05.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |
19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
11.03.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.04.2011 [2011/15] |
14.01.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] |
26.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] |
19.11.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
27.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
11.12.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 13.01.2010 [2010/02] |
04.12.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
25.09.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.05.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2009 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
06.03.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.04.2009 [2009/15] |
18.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.08.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] |
01.08.2008 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
01.08.2008 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] |
09.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.05.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |