Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7513736 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2009 | B2 | US2006120862 | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1669596 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2010 | B1 | EP1669596 | 03.09.2008 | A3 | EP1669596 | 14.06.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE455245T | 15.01.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004058776 | 13.07.2006 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005008861D1 | 04.03.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2335594T | 30.03.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO331131B | 17.10.2011 | B1 | NO20055788L | 08.06.2006 | L | NO20055788D0 | 06.12.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | DE102004058776 | 07.12.2004 |