EP1669596 - Ventilating device for the rotor hub of a wind generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORDEX Energy GmbH Langenhorner Chaussee 600 DE-22419 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/02] | For all designated states NORDEX Energy GmbH Bornbarch 2 22848 Norderstedt / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states NORDEX ENERGY GmbH Bornbarch 2 22848 Norderstedt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jannasch, Henrik Liskowstrasse 18 18059 Rostock / DE | 02 /
Kroh, Uwe Louis-Pasteur-Strasse 10 18059 Rostock / DE | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 31 53 20431 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Hauck, Graalfs, Wehnert, Döring, Siemons Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05023831.0 | 02.11.2005 | [2006/24] | Priority number, date | DE20041058776 | 07.12.2004 Original published format: DE102004058776 | [2006/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1669596 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1669596 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1669596 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06, F03D11/00 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
F03D1/0691 (EP,US);
F03D80/60 (EP,US);
F05B2260/60 (EP,US);
F05B2260/602 (EP,US);
F05B2260/64 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | F03D1/06, F03D7/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Belüftung einer Rotornabe einer Windenergieanlage | [2006/24] | English: | Ventilating device for the rotor hub of a wind generator | [2006/24] | French: | Dispositif de ventilation pour le moyeu de rotor d'une éolienne | [2006/24] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 08.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 13.01.2010 | CZ | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | IT | 13.01.2010 | LT | 13.01.2010 | LV | 13.01.2010 | NL | 13.01.2010 | PL | 13.01.2010 | PT | 13.01.2010 | RO | 13.01.2010 | SE | 13.01.2010 | SI | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | TR | 13.01.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | IS | 13.05.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
TR | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
HU | 14.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | CY | 13.01.2010 | |
CZ | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
RO | 13.01.2010 | ||
SE | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | LT | 13.01.2010 | |
NL | 13.01.2010 | ||
PL | 13.01.2010 | ||
SI | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JPS5865977 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]EP1375913 (HIGH TECHNOLOGY INVEST BV [NL]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0046] , [0047] ** figure 3 *; | [A]US2004160063 (LE NABOUR MARCEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0070] * * figure 6 * |