EP1662098 - Variable valve drive of an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states Schaeffler KG Industriestrasse 1-3 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Golovatai-Schmidt, Eduard Breitäcker 5 91341 Röttenbach / DE | 02 /
Vacarescu, Valeria, Prof.- Dr. Str. Stefan Stinca 63 1900 Timisoara / RO | 03 /
Reik, Wolfgang, Dr. Sonnhalde 8 77815 Bühl / DE | [2006/22] | Application number, filing date | 05024165.2 | 05.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | DE20041057574 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: DE102004057574 | [2006/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1662098 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1662098 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F01L13/00, F01L1/18, F01L1/24, F01L9/02, F01L13/06 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
F01L1/185 (EP);
F01L1/2405 (EP);
F01L13/0031 (EP);
F01L13/065 (EP);
F01L9/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/06] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Variabler Ventiltrieb einer Brennkraftmaschine | [2006/22] | English: | Variable valve drive of an internal combustion engine | [2006/22] | French: | Commande de soupape variable de moteur à combustion interne | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 05.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 20.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3797469 (KOBAYASHI M, et al) [Y] 1 * column 2, lines 48-53; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4158348 (MASON LLOYD R, et al) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4167931 (IIZUKA HARUHIKO) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [X]DE3026529 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1,3,4; claim 1 *; | [A]US4615307 (KODAMA HISASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5150678 (WITTMANN DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figures 1,2,5; claim 1 *; | [A]DE4318293 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1,8-10 * figure 2 *; | [DA]DE10242866 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [DA] 1,5,6,10,11 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1462623 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1,6* the whole document * | by applicant | DE10156309 | DE10242866 |