Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
21.05.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] |
01.12.2009 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
25.11.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.06.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] |
27.11.2007 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
27.11.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.08.2007 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
05.01.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 07.02.2007 [2007/06] |
21.11.2006 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
14.07.2006 | First examination report | |
11.07.2006 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
14.04.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
14.04.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |