EP1661782 - Vehicular turning control apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 221-0023 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishimoto, Takeshi 1-1-17-307, Fukaminishi Yamato-shi Kanagawa 242-0018 / JP | [2006/22] | Representative(s) | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/22] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner, Patentanwälte, Gabriel-Max-Strasse 29 81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025060.4 | 16.11.2005 | [2006/22] | Priority number, date | JP20040344388 | 29.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004344388 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1661782 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1661782 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/06, B60W10/18, B60T8/1755, B60T8/24, B60W30/02, B60W50/08 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
B60W40/114 (EP,US);
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60T8/246 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W30/02 (EP,US);
B60W30/045 (EP,US);
B60W40/064 (EP,US);
B60W40/11 (EP,US);
B60W40/112 (EP,US);
B60T2201/16 (EP,US);
B60W2520/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/106 (EP,US);
B60W2710/06 (EP,US);
B60W2710/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/06] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Regelung der Kurvenfahrt eines Fahrzeugs | [2006/22] | English: | Vehicular turning control apparatus and method | [2006/22] | French: | Système et méthode pour règler le mouvement d'un véhicule en virage | [2006/22] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 07.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2007 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0656275 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,19 * page 7, line 49 - page 12, line 47; figures 3,6 *; | [X]EP1080972 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,6,7,9,10,13,15,16,18,19 * column 10, paragraph 51 - column 11, paragraph 58; figure 6 *; | [A]US6366844 (WOYWOD JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-19* figure 5 *; | [XY]EP1195303 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,12,14,15,17,19 * column 11, paragraph 61 - column 15, paragraph 83; figures 1,2,4-8 * [Y] 2,11; | [Y]DE10359393 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [Y] 2,11 * page 3, paragraph 11 * | by applicant | JP2600876B | JP2004344388 |