EP1788022 - Polypropylene resin with low shrinkage, high impact strength, stiffness and scratch resistance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis Technology Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Machl, Doris Grabnerstrasse 25 4020 Linz / AT | 02 /
Bernreitner, Klaus Zaubertalstr. 1 4010 Linz / AT | 03 /
Grein, Christelle Harrachstr. 28 4020 Linz / AT | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025068.7 | 16.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1788022 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1788022 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/10, C08L23/16 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
C08L23/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/0815 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/142 (EP,KR,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/10, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L23/12, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/142, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/06 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Title | German: | Polypropylenharzzusammensetzung mit geringer Schrumpfung, hoher Schlagfestigkeit, Steifheit und Kratzfestigkeit | [2007/21] | English: | Polypropylene resin with low shrinkage, high impact strength, stiffness and scratch resistance | [2007/21] | French: | Composition de résine de polypropylène ayant une faible rétraction, une haute résistance au choc, rigidité et une haute résistance aux rayures | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2005 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 23.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 20.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 31.12.2008 | CY | 31.12.2008 | DK | 31.12.2008 | EE | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | LT | 31.12.2008 | LV | 31.12.2008 | RO | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | BG | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | IS | 30.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | [2013/44] |
Former [2011/44] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
CY | 31.12.2008 | ||
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
RO | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/52] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
BG | 31.03.2009 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
DK | 31.12.2008 | ||
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | AT | 31.12.2008 | |
EE | 31.12.2008 | ||
FI | 31.12.2008 | ||
LT | 31.12.2008 | ||
LV | 31.12.2008 | ||
IS | 30.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
LV | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1065241 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0163] - paragraph [0166] * * paragraph [0220] - paragraph [0224] * * example 5; table 2 * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002082328 (YU YOUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0026] ** claim 1 * |