EP1787738 - Joining method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/21] | Joining method and device | ||
[2010/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Behr France Hambach S.A.R.L. Zone Europole de Sarreguemines 57910 Hambach / FR | [2007/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaczmarek, Fabrice 14, rue des Champs 57910 Hambach / FR | 02 /
Röhm, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. (BA) Gartenstrasse 13 71394 Kernen i.R. / DE | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Grauel, Andreas BEHR GmbH & Co., Intellectual Property Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Grauel, Andreas Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025086.9 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787738 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1787738 | Date: | 02.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B21D39/03 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
B21D39/032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2008/05] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fixierverfahren | [2010/05] | English: | Joining method | [2010/05] | French: | Procédé de fixation | [2010/05] |
Former [2007/21] | Fixierverfahren und -vorrichtung | ||
Former [2007/21] | Joining method and device | ||
Former [2007/21] | Procédé et dispositif de fixation | Examination procedure | 23.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/01] | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 13.09.2010 | [2013/46] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2713893 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-8* figures 2,3 *; | [X]US4728842 (MARTIN BENSON D [US]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3936967 (KARL MARX STADT HAUSHALTGERAET [DD]) [X] 1-8 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE10309381 (MDS MASCHINEN UND WERKZEUGBAU [DE]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0024]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2005091831 (MURAKAMI FUMIYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 4-6 * | by applicant | EP0150518 | DE19929375 | DE10315718 |