EP1719832 - Washing machine and suds removal method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/39] |
Former [2006/45] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-Do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ha, Yo Chul 4-911, Dongnam APT. Maetan-4-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 02 /
Chai, Chang Joo B-201, Hyundae Villa 499-5,Wooman-1-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
O, Hyeon Seok 601-401, Doosan APT. Myeonmok-Dong Joongrang-Gu Seoul / KR | [2016/41] |
Former [2006/45] | 01 /
Ha, Yo Chul 4-911, Dongnam APT. Maetan-4-Dong Yeongtong-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | ||
02 /
Chai, Chang Joo B-201, Hyundae Villa 499-5,Wooman-1-Dong Paldal-Gu Suwon-Si Gyeonggi-Do / KR | |||
03 /
O, Hyeon Seok 601-401, Doosan APT. Myeonmok-Dong Joongrang-Gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/41] |
Former [2006/45] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025183.4 | 17.11.2005 | [2006/45] | Priority number, date | KR20050037727 | 04.05.2005 Original published format: KR 2005037727 | [2006/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1719832 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1719832 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/06, D06F35/00 | [2006/45] | CPC: |
D06F39/06 (EP,US);
D06F2101/00 (EP,US);
D06F2103/18 (EP,US);
D06F2103/46 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2016/41] |
Former [2007/28] | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL | ||
Former [2006/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Waschmaschine und deren Verfahren zum Entfernen von Schaum | [2006/45] | English: | Washing machine and suds removal method thereof | [2006/45] | French: | Machine à laver et son procédé d'élimination de la mousse | [2006/45] | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 27.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2007 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 12.10.2016 | NL | 12.10.2016 | FR | 12.12.2016 | [2017/50] |
Former [2017/45] | IT | 12.10.2016 | |
NL | 12.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/33] | NL | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0390343 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 1 * page 4, lines 25-30,48-58 * * page 5, lines 1-31 * [A] 2-4,14,19,21,23; | [XA]US5890247 (ERICKSON DONALD E [US], et al) [X] 1,6-10,12 * column 2, lines 20-53 * * column 5, lines 17-35 * * column 10, lines 21-34 * * column 11, lines 25-51 * * figures 1-3; claims 1,10 * [A] 2-4,18,19,21-23; | [XA]WO2004015189 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,8-12 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 12 * * page 4, line 9 - page 5, line 5 * * figures 1,2; claims 1-10 * [A] 2,5,15,16,19-23; | [E]EP1688528 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [E] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0018] * * paragraphs [0042] - [0050] ** figures 1-3 * | by applicant | KR100282343B | KR20060088661 | KR20060088663 |