EP1658939 - Circular blade holder with guard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Bilstein GmbH & Co. KG Kölner Strasse 27-29 51491 Overath / DE | [2010/18] |
Former [2006/21] | For all designated states Wilhelm Bilstein KG Spezialfabrik für Maschinenmesser und Kompressorventile Kölner Strasse 27/29 51491 Overath / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bilstein Willi Liegnitzer Strasse 6 51491 Overath / DE | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Maxton Langmaack & Partner Postfach 51 08 06 50944 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025198.2 | 18.11.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | DE20042017934U | 18.11.2004 Original published format: DE 202004017934 U | DE20042019430U | 16.12.2004 Original published format: DE 202004019430 U | DE20052001029U | 22.01.2005 Original published format: DE 202005001029 U | DE20052012749U | 12.08.2005 Original published format: DE 202005012749 U | [2006/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1658939 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1658939 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/22 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
B26D7/22 (EP);
B26D1/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/21] | Title | German: | Kreismesserhalter mit Handschutz | [2006/21] | English: | Circular blade holder with guard | [2006/21] | French: | Support pour une lame circulaire avec protection | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 14.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/21] | 04.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IE | 07.07.2010 | LT | 07.07.2010 | LV | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | IS | 07.11.2010 | PT | 08.11.2010 | AT | 18.11.2010 | LU | 18.11.2010 | BE | 30.11.2010 | CH | 30.11.2010 | LI | 30.11.2010 | MC | 30.11.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
AT | 18.11.2010 | ||
LU | 18.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
AT | 18.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
AT | 18.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
BE | 30.11.2010 | ||
CH | 30.11.2010 | ||
LI | 30.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
MC | 30.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
LV | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
IS | 07.11.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 07.07.2010 | |
LT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
PT | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | LT | 07.07.2010 | |
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE3841576 (DIENES WERKE FUER MASCHINENTEILE GMBH & CO KG, 5063 OVERATH, DE) [DA] * column 1, line 59 - line 61 *; | [XY]EP0562454 (CAVAGNA ELIO SRL [IT]) [X] 1-11,13-16 * the whole document * [Y] 12,17; | [Y]DE20208890U (DIENES WERKE [DE]) [Y] 12,17* abstract * | by applicant | DE3146123 | DE3712078 | DE3841576 | EP0925159 |