EP1671660 - Hot melt adhesives for medical application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 17.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2010 | Revocation of patent | published on 20.10.2010 [2010/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstraße 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states National Starch and Chemical Investment Holding Corporation 1000 Uniqema Boulevard New Castle Delaware 19720 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paul, Charles W. 13 Shadylawn Drive Madison New Jersey 07940 / US | 02 /
Palasz, Peter D. 59 Conway Road Taplow Maidenhead SL6 0LB / GB | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2010/25] |
Former [2006/25] | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 03 29 81630 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025345.9 | 21.11.2005 | [2006/25] | Priority number, date | US20040630915P | 24.11.2004 Original published format: US 630915 P | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671660 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1671660 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/04, A61L15/58, A61K9/70, C09J7/02 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
A61L15/42 (EP,US);
A61L15/58 (EP,US);
A61K9/7023 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2852 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/09] |
Former [2006/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schmelzklebemassen für medizinische Zwecke | [2006/25] | English: | Hot melt adhesives for medical application | [2006/25] | French: | Adhésifs thermofusibles pour applications médicales | [2009/12] |
Former [2006/25] | Adhésives thermofusibles pour applications médicales | Examination procedure | 19.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 22.12.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.04.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.02.2010
11.02.2010
ADMISSIBLE Novamelt GmbH Klebstofftechnologie Öflinger Strasse 120 79664 Wehr / DE Opponent's representative Hinkelmann, Klaus, et al, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Hinkelmann Lyonel-Feininger-Strasse 28 80807 München / DE | [2010/11] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 05.06.2010 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2010/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.01.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 25.01.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4243500 (GLENNON ALFRED E) [A] 1-18 * examples 1-4 * * claims 1-41 *; | [A]EP0259968 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 3, line 44 - page 4, line 37 *; | [A]EP0342808 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1-18 * claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5695837 (EVERAERTS ALBERT I [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * column 10, line 59 - line 62 * * claims 1-27 *; | [X]EP1431363 (NAT STARCH CHEM INVEST [US]) [X] 1-18 * examples 1,2 * * claims 1-12 *; | [PX]WO2005080518 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [PX] 1-18 * page 37, line 6 - page 64, line 5 *; | [PX]WO2005080520 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [PX] 1-18 * page 15, line 5 - line 32 * * claims 64-67 * * examples 1-8 *; | [PX]WO2005080521 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [PX] 1-18* the whole document * |