EP1659285 - Vehicle engine starting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fucho-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 735-8670 / JP | [2006/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hosoya, Hideki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fucho-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Sugiyama, Takanori c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi Fucho-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima / JP | [2006/21] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/21] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025446.5 | 22.11.2005 | [2006/21] | Priority number, date | JP20040337996 | 22.11.2004 Original published format: JP 2004337996 | [2006/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659285 | Date: | 24.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1659285 | Date: | 28.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02N11/08, F02N17/08 | [2006/21] | CPC: |
F02N11/0814 (EP);
B60W10/06 (EP);
B60W10/115 (EP);
B60W30/18018 (EP);
F02D41/023 (EP);
F02N19/00 (EP);
F02N99/006 (EP);
B60W2510/101 (EP);
F02D2200/502 (EP);
F02D2400/12 (EP);
F02D41/042 (EP);
F02N2019/007 (EP);
Y02T10/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2018/07] |
Former [2006/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Anlassen eines Fahrzeugmotors | [2006/21] | English: | Vehicle engine starting system | [2006/21] | French: | Système pour démarrer un moteur de véhicule | [2006/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2005 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 02.01.2018 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH07266932 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2004124754 (MAZDA MOTOR) [AD] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004153231 (ITOH YOSHIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [E]EP1600629 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [E] 1,2 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0056] * | by applicant | JPH07266932 | JP2004124754 |