EP1688827 - Universal X,Y-axis positioning input method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cheng, Yu-Chih 3F, No. 15, Lane 45 Longjiang Road Taipei / TW | [2006/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/36] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Helms, Joachim Patentanwalt Dantestrasse 27 80637 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025520.7 | 23.11.2005 | [2006/32] | Priority number, date | CN2005107935 | 05.02.2005 Original published format: CN200510007935 | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1688827 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1688827 | Date: | 27.01.2010 | [2010/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1688827 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1688827 | Date: | 06.02.2013 | [2013/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/023 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G06F3/0236 (EP,US);
G06F3/02 (KR);
G06F3/04886 (US);
G06F3/0238 (EP,US);
G06F3/0482 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Title | German: | Universelles Eingabeverfahren zur X,Y-Achsenpositionierung | [2006/32] | English: | Universal X,Y-axis positioning input method | [2006/32] | French: | Procédé d'entrée de positionnement universel selon les axes X et Y | [2006/32] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/20] | 20.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.11.2005 | AT | 26.09.2012 | BE | 26.09.2012 | CY | 26.09.2012 | CZ | 26.09.2012 | DK | 26.09.2012 | EE | 26.09.2012 | LT | 26.09.2012 | LV | 26.09.2012 | PL | 26.09.2012 | RO | 26.09.2012 | SE | 26.09.2012 | SI | 26.09.2012 | SK | 26.09.2012 | TR | 26.09.2012 | IE | 23.11.2012 | LU | 23.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | BG | 26.12.2012 | GR | 27.12.2012 | IS | 26.01.2013 | PT | 28.01.2013 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.11.2012 | ||
LU | 23.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
TR | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
DK | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
BG | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 26.09.2012 | |
BE | 26.09.2012 | ||
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
PT | 28.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CY | 26.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
PL | 26.09.2012 | ||
RO | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
SK | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
CZ | 26.09.2012 | ||
EE | 26.09.2012 | ||
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
IS | 26.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 26.09.2012 | |
LT | 26.09.2012 | ||
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | LT | 26.09.2012 | |
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SE | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | LT | 26.09.2012 | |
LV | 26.09.2012 | ||
SI | 26.09.2012 | ||
GR | 27.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 26.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3967273 (KNOWLTON KENNETH CHARLES) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 2; figure 1 *; | [A]US5184315 (LAPEYRE JAMES M [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 42 - column 5, line 4 ** column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5990890 (ETHEREDGE ROBERT C [US]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * column 2, line 16 - line 50 * * column 15, line 35 - column 16, line 57; figures 16-19 *; | [A]WO0182045 (YAU FOOK HING [CN]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * |