EP1790248 - Stand with a damping element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.2009 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ondal Holding GmbH Wellastrasse 6 36088 Hünfeld / DE | [2007/49] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kellner, Frank Tuchmacherweg 2 36251 Bad Hersfeld / DE | 02 /
Moll, Hans Am Mühlgraben 22 36088 Hünfeld / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/52] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Graf von Stosch Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/40] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Prinzregentenstrasse 22 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/47] | Graf von Stosch, Andreas Patentanwälte Bosch, Graf v. Stosch, Jehle Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025612.2 | 24.11.2005 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790248 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1790248 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A45D20/12 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
A45D44/06 (EP,US);
A45D20/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Title | German: | Ständer mit Dämpfungselement | [2007/22] | English: | Stand with a damping element | [2007/22] | French: | Support avec élément d'amortissement | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 25.11.2005 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 28.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.10.2008 | CZ | 15.10.2008 | EE | 15.10.2008 | FI | 15.10.2008 | LT | 15.10.2008 | LV | 15.10.2008 | PL | 15.10.2008 | RO | 15.10.2008 | SI | 15.10.2008 | SK | 15.10.2008 | TR | 15.10.2008 | IE | 24.11.2008 | LU | 24.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | BG | 15.01.2009 | SE | 15.01.2009 | GR | 16.01.2009 | ES | 26.01.2009 | IS | 15.02.2009 | PT | 16.03.2009 | HU | 16.04.2009 | [2010/52] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 15.10.2008 | |
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
TR | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 15.10.2008 | |
CZ | 15.10.2008 | ||
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
HU | 16.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
LU | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
IE | 24.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/45] | CZ | 15.10.2008 | |
EE | 15.10.2008 | ||
FI | 15.10.2008 | ||
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
RO | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
SK | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
SE | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
LV | 15.10.2008 | ||
PL | 15.10.2008 | ||
SI | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
PT | 16.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/24] | FI | 15.10.2008 | |
LT | 15.10.2008 | ||
BG | 15.01.2009 | ||
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
IS | 15.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 15.10.2008 | |
ES | 26.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | ES | 26.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB334312 (ROBERT ALLEN) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 8 - page 1, line 52 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US1782660 (WILLIAM MEYER) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 57 - page 2, line 37 ** figure 2 *; | [X]US3989211 (GUNDLACH ARNOLD) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 16 - column 4, line 30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0441267 (STABILUS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * page 5, line 35 - page 5, line 52 * * figure 1 *; | [X]EP1374725 (PALMBERG BUEROEINRICHTUNGEN & [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * column 3, paragraph 16 - column 5, paragraph 23 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2004173954 (POOSCHEN HARALD [DE]) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * |