EP1790932 - Coiled heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schönberger, Manfred Stefan, Dipl.-Ing. Wartmoning 8 83342 Tacherting / DE | 02 /
Bauer, Stefan Schwarzauer Weg 4 83352 Altenmarkt / DE | 03 /
Hölzl, Reinhold St.-Hubertusstrasse 5 82538 Geretsried / DE | 04 /
Müller, Eva Jägerstrasse 26 83308 Trostberg / DE | 05 /
Steinbauer, Manfred Ledergasse 20 82399 Raisting / DE | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Imhof, Dietmar, et al Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | Imhof, Dietmar, et al Linde AG Patente und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025682.5 | 24.11.2005 | [2007/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790932 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | F28D7/04, F28F9/013 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
F25J5/002 (EP,US);
F28D7/04 (EP,US);
F28F9/005 (EP,US);
F28F9/013 (EP,US);
F25J2290/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Gewickelter Wärmetauscher | [2007/22] | English: | Coiled heat exchanger | [2007/22] | French: | Serpentin d'échangeur de chaleur | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 29.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CH477666 (SULZER AG [CH]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 3, line 7 - line 13; figure - *; | DE1501535 [ ] (HYMATIC ENG CO LTD) [ ] * page 4, paragraph 2 *; | [X]DE1551459 (HYMATC ENGINEERING COMPANY LTD) [X] 1-5,9 * page 3, paragraph 2; figure -; claim 1 *; | [XY]GB1267191 (INTERNATIONAL COMBUSTION LIMITED) [X] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 114 - page 4, line 52; figure - * [Y] 4,6-9; | [Y]US4116270 (MARUSHKIN RUF FEDOROVICH, et al) [Y] 4 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 17 * * column 8, line 34 - line 42; figures 1,3 *; | [DY]DE19707475 (LINDE AG [DE]) [DY] 6-9 * abstract *; | [X]DE20314766U (WITZENMANN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * figure -; claims 11,13 * | by applicant | DE1501519 | DE1912341 | DE19517114 | DE19707475 | DE19848280 | - HAUSEN; LINDE, TIEFTEMPERATURTECHNIK, (1985), pages 471 - 475 | - W. SCHOLZ, "Gewickelte Rohrwärmeaustauscher", LINDE-BERICHTE AUS TECHNIK UND WISSENSCHAFT, (1973), no. 33, pages 34 - 39 | - W. BACH, "Offshore-Erdgasverflüssigung mit Stickstoffkälte - Prozessauslegung und Vergleich von Gewickelten Rohr- und Plattenwärmetauschern", LINDE-BERICHTE AUS TECHNIK UND WISSENSCHAFT, (1990), no. 64, pages 31 - 37 | - W. FÖRG, "Ein neuer LNG Baseload Prozess und die Herstellung der Hauptwärmeaustauscher", LINDE-BERICHTE AUS TECHNIK UND WISSENSCHAFT, (1999), no. 78, pages 3 - 11 | - FASSUNG: W. FÖRG, "A New LNG Baseload Process and Manufacturing of the Main Heat Exchanger", LINDE REPORTS ON SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY, (1999), no. 61, pages 3 - 11 |